Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 13 of 13
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abbott, Hon. Jim | Canadian Alliance | Kootenay—Columbia | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Ablonczy, Hon. Diane | Canadian Alliance | Calgary—Nose Hill | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Adams, Hon. Peter | Liberal | Peterborough | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Alarie, Hélène | Bloc Québécois | Louis-Hébert | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Alcock, Hon. Reg | Liberal | Winnipeg South | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Anders, Rob | Canadian Alliance | Calgary West | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Anderson, Hon. David A. | Liberal | Victoria | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Assad, Mark | Liberal | Gatineau | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Assadourian, Sarkis | Liberal | Brampton Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Asselin, Gérard | Bloc Québécois | Charlevoix | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Augustine, Jean | Liberal | Etobicoke—Lakeshore | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Axworthy, Chris | NDP | Saskatoon—Rosetown—Biggar | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Tuesday, June 1, 1999 |
Axworthy, Hon. Lloyd | Liberal | Winnipeg South Centre | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.