Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anderson, David | Conservative | Cypress Hills—Grasslands | Saskatchewan | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Goodale, Hon. Ralph | Liberal | Regina—Wascana | Saskatchewan | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Hoback, Randy | Conservative | Prince Albert | Saskatchewan | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Kitchen, Robert | Conservative | Souris—Moose Mountain | Saskatchewan | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Lukiwski, Tom | Conservative | Moose Jaw—Lake Centre—Lanigan | Saskatchewan | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Ritz, Hon. Gerry | Conservative | Battlefords—Lloydminster | Saskatchewan | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Monday, October 2, 2017 |
Scheer, Hon. Andrew | Conservative | Regina—Qu'Appelle | Saskatchewan | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Trost, Brad | Conservative | Saskatoon—University | Saskatchewan | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Waugh, Kevin | Conservative | Saskatoon—Grasswood | Saskatchewan | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Weir, Erin | Co-operative Commonwealth Federation | Regina—Lewvan | Saskatchewan | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.