Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 48 of 48
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aubin, Robert | NDP | Trois-Rivières | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Bellavance, André | Independent | Richmond—Arthabaska | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Benskin, Tyrone | NDP | Jeanne-Le Ber | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Bernier, Hon. Maxime | Conservative | Beauce | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Blanchette, Denis | NDP | Louis-Hébert | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Blaney, Hon. Steven | Conservative | Lévis—Bellechasse | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Boulerice, Alexandre | NDP | Rosemont—La Petite-Patrie | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Brahmi, Tarik | NDP | Saint-Jean | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Caron, Guy | NDP | Rimouski-Neigette—Témiscouata—Les Basques | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Chicoine, Sylvain | NDP | Châteauguay—Saint-Constant | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Choquette, François | NDP | Drummond | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Coderre, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, June 2, 2013 |
Côté, Raymond | NDP | Beauport—Limoilou | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Cotler, Hon. Irwin | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dion, Hon. Stéphane | Liberal | Saint-Laurent—Cartierville | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dionne Labelle, Pierre | NDP | Rivière-du-Nord | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dubé, Matthew | NDP | Chambly—Borduas | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dubourg, Emmanuel | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Monday, November 25, 2013 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dusseault, Pierre-Luc | NDP | Sherbrooke | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Fortin, Jean-François | Haute-Gaspésie—La Mitis—Matane—Matapédia | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 | |
Garneau, Hon. Marc | Liberal | Westmount—Ville-Marie | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Genest-Jourdain, Jonathan | NDP | Manicouagan | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Genest, Réjean | NDP | Shefford | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Giguère, Alain | NDP | Marc-Aurèle-Fortin | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Gourde, Jacques | Conservative | Lotbinière—Chutes-de-la-Chaudière | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Jacob, Pierre | NDP | Brome—Missisquoi | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Lapointe, François | NDP | Montmagny—L'Islet—Kamouraska—Rivière-du-Loup | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Larose, Jean-François | Repentigny | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 | |
Lebel, Hon. Denis | Conservative | Roberval—Lac-Saint-Jean | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Mai, Hoang | NDP | Brossard—La Prairie | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Morin, Dany | NDP | Chicoutimi—Le Fjord | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Morin, Marc-André | NDP | Laurentides—Labelle | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Mulcair, Hon. Thomas J. | NDP | Outremont | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Nantel, Pierre | NDP | Longueuil—Pierre-Boucher | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Nicholls, Jamie | NDP | Vaudreuil-Soulanges | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Nunez-Melo, José | Independent | Laval | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Pacetti, Massimo | Independent | Saint-Léonard—Saint-Michel | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Paradis, Hon. Christian | Conservative | Mégantic—L'Érable | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Patry, Claude | Bloc Québécois | Jonquière—Alma | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Pilon, François | NDP | Laval—Les Îles | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Plamondon, Louis | Bloc Québécois | Bas-Richelieu—Nicolet—Bécancour | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Ravignat, Mathieu | NDP | Pontiac | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Rousseau, Jean | NDP | Compton—Stanstead | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Saganash, Romeo | NDP | Abitibi—Baie-James—Nunavik—Eeyou | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Scarpaleggia, Francis | Liberal | Lac-Saint-Louis | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Toone, Philip | NDP | Gaspésie—Îles-de-la-Madeleine | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Tremblay, Jonathan | NDP | Montmorency—Charlevoix—Haute-Côte-Nord | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Trudeau, Right Hon. Justin | Liberal | Papineau | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.