Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Casey, Sean | Liberal | Charlottetown | Prince Edward Island | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Easter, Hon. Wayne | Liberal | Malpeque | Prince Edward Island | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
MacAulay, Hon. Lawrence | Liberal | Cardigan | Prince Edward Island | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.