Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 12 of 12
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Crowder, Jean | NDP | Nanaimo—Cowichan | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Davies, Libby | NDP | Vancouver East | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Findlay, Hon. Kerry-Lynne D. | Conservative | Delta—Richmond East | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Fry, Hon. Hedy | Liberal | Vancouver Centre | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Grewal, Nina | Conservative | Fleetwood—Port Kells | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
May, Elizabeth | Green Party | Saanich—Gulf Islands | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
McLeod, Cathy | Conservative | Kamloops—Thompson—Cariboo | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Murray, Joyce | Liberal | Vancouver Quadra | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Savoie, Denise | NDP | Victoria | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Friday, August 31, 2012 |
Sims, Jinny Jogindera | NDP | Newton—North Delta | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Wong, Hon. Alice | Conservative | Richmond | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Young, Wai | Conservative | Vancouver South | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.