Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 20 of 20
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bakopanos, Hon. Eleni | Liberal | Ahuntsic | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Boivin, Françoise | Liberal | Gatineau | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bonsant, France | Bloc Québécois | Compton—Stanstead | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bourgeois, Diane | Bloc Québécois | Terrebonne—Blainville | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Brunelle, Paule | Bloc Québécois | Trois-Rivières | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Demers, Nicole | Bloc Québécois | Laval | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Deschamps, Johanne | Bloc Québécois | Laurentides—Labelle | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Faille, Meili | Bloc Québécois | Vaudreuil-Soulanges | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Folco, Raymonde | Liberal | Laval—Les Îles | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Frulla, Hon. Liza | Liberal | Jeanne-Le Ber | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Gagnon, Christiane | Bloc Québécois | Québec | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Guay, Monique | Bloc Québécois | Rivière-du-Nord | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Jennings, Hon. Marlene | Liberal | Notre-Dame-de-Grâce—Lachine | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lalonde, Francine | Bloc Québécois | La Pointe-de-l'Île | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lavallée, Carole | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Bruno—Saint-Hubert | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Picard, Pauline | Bloc Québécois | Drummond | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Poirier-Rivard, Denise | Bloc Québécois | Châteauguay—Saint-Constant | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Robillard, Hon. Lucienne | Liberal | Westmount—Ville-Marie | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
St-Hilaire, Caroline | Bloc Québécois | Longueuil—Pierre-Boucher | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Thibault, Louise | Bloc Québécois | Rimouski-Neigette—Témiscouata—Les Basques | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.