Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 11 of 11
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernier, Hon. Maxime | Conservative | Beauce | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Blackburn, Hon. Jean-Pierre | Conservative | Jonquière—Alma | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Blaney, Hon. Steven | Conservative | Lévis—Bellechasse | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Boucher, Sylvie | Conservative | Beauport—Limoilou | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Cannon, Hon. Lawrence | Conservative | Pontiac | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Généreux, Bernard | Conservative | Montmagny—L'Islet—Kamouraska—Rivière-du-Loup | Quebec | Monday, November 9, 2009 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Gourde, Jacques | Conservative | Lotbinière—Chutes-de-la-Chaudière | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Lebel, Hon. Denis | Conservative | Roberval—Lac-Saint-Jean | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Paradis, Hon. Christian | Conservative | Mégantic—L'Érable | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Petit, Daniel | Conservative | Charlesbourg—Haute-Saint-Charles | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Verner, Hon. Josée | Conservative | Louis-Saint-Laurent | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.