Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 3 of 3
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doyle, Hon. Norman E. | Conservative | St. John's East | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Hearn, Hon. Loyola | Conservative | St. John's South—Mount Pearl | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Manning, Hon. Fabian | Conservative | Avalon | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.