Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 13 of 13
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anderson, David | Conservative | Cypress Hills—Grasslands | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Batters, Dave | Conservative | Palliser | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Breitkreuz, Garry | Conservative | Yorkton—Melville | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Fitzpatrick, Brian | Conservative | Prince Albert | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Harrison, Jeremy | Conservative | Desnethé—Missinippi—Churchill River | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Komarnicki, Ed | Conservative | Souris—Moose Mountain | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lukiwski, Tom | Conservative | Regina—Lumsden—Lake Centre | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Ritz, Hon. Gerry | Conservative | Battlefords—Lloydminster | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Scheer, Andrew | Conservative | Regina—Qu'Appelle | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Skelton, Hon. Carol | Conservative | Saskatoon—Rosetown—Biggar | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Trost, Brad | Conservative | Saskatoon—Humboldt | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Vellacott, Maurice | Conservative | Saskatoon—Wanuskewin | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Yelich, Hon. Lynne | Conservative | Blackstrap | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.