Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 23 of 23
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allison, Dean | Conservative | Niagara West—Glanbrook | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Brown, Gordon | Conservative | Leeds—Grenville | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Carrie, Colin | Conservative | Oshawa | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Chong, Hon. Michael D. | Conservative | Wellington—Halton Hills | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Devolin, Barry | Conservative | Haliburton—Kawartha Lakes—Brock | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Finley, Hon. Diane | Conservative | Haldimand—Norfolk | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Gallant, Cheryl | Conservative | Renfrew—Nipissing—Pembroke | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Goodyear, Hon. Gary | Conservative | Cambridge | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Guergis, Hon. Helena | Conservative | Simcoe—Grey | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Kramp, Daryl | Conservative | Prince Edward—Hastings | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lauzon, Guy | Conservative | Stormont—Dundas—South Glengarry | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
MacKenzie, Dave | Conservative | Oxford | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Miller, Larry | Conservative | Bruce—Grey—Owen Sound | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Nicholson, Hon. Rob | Conservative | Niagara Falls | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
O'Connor, Hon. Gordon | Conservative | Carleton—Mississippi Mills | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Oda, Hon. Bev | Conservative | Durham | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Poilievre, Pierre | Conservative | Nepean—Carleton | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Preston, Joe | Conservative | Elgin—Middlesex—London | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Reid, Scott | Conservative | Lanark—Frontenac—Lennox and Addington | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Schellenberger, Gary Ralph | Conservative | Perth—Wellington | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Tilson, David | Conservative | Dufferin—Caledon | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Van Loan, Hon. Peter | Conservative | York—Simcoe | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Watson, Jeff | Conservative | Essex | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.