Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doyle, Hon. Norman E. | Conservative | St. John's East | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Hearn, Hon. Loyola | Conservative | St. John's South—Mount Pearl | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.