Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Borotsik, Rick | Conservative | Brandon—Souris | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Hilstrom, Howard | Conservative | Selkirk—Interlake | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Mark, Inky | Conservative | Dauphin—Swan River | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Pallister, Brian | Conservative | Portage—Lisgar | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Toews, Hon. Vic | Conservative | Provencher | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.