Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrews, Scott | Independent | Avalon | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Bellavance, André | Independent | Richmond—Arthabaska | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Lunney, James | Independent | Nanaimo—Alberni | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Nunez-Melo, José | Independent | Laval | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Pacetti, Massimo | Independent | Saint-Léonard—Saint-Michel | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Rathgeber, Brent | Independent | Edmonton—St. Albert | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Thibeault, Glenn | Independent | Sudbury | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Monday, January 5, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.