Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keeper, Tina | Liberal | Churchill | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Neville, Hon. Anita | Liberal | Winnipeg South Centre | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Simard, Hon. Raymond | Liberal | Saint Boniface | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.