Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brison, Hon. Scott | Liberal | Kings—Hants | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Cuzner, Rodger | Liberal | Cape Breton—Canso | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Eyking, Hon. Mark | Liberal | Sydney—Victoria | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Regan, Hon. Geoff | Liberal | Halifax West | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Savage, Michael John | Liberal | Dartmouth—Cole Harbour | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Thibault, Hon. Robert | Liberal | West Nova | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.