Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 40 of 40
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allard, Carole-Marie | Liberal | Laval East | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Assad, Mark | Liberal | Gatineau | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Bakopanos, Hon. Eleni | Liberal | Ahuntsic | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Barrette, Gilbert | Liberal | Témiscamingue | Quebec | Monday, June 16, 2003 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Bertrand, Robert | Liberal | Pontiac—Gatineau—Labelle | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Binet, Gérard | Liberal | Frontenac—Mégantic | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Cauchon, Hon. Martin | Liberal | Outremont | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Charbonneau, Hon. Yvon | Liberal | Anjou—Rivière-des-Prairies | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Chrétien, Right Hon. Jean | Liberal | Saint-Maurice | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Friday, December 12, 2003 |
Coderre, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Cotler, Hon. Irwin | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Dion, Hon. Stéphane | Liberal | Saint-Laurent—Cartierville | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Discepola, Nick | Liberal | Vaudreuil—Soulanges | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Drouin, Hon. Claude | Liberal | Beauce | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Duplain, Claude | Liberal | Portneuf | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Farrah, Hon. Georges | Liberal | Bonaventure—Gaspé—Îles-de-la-Madeleine—Pabok | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Folco, Raymonde | Liberal | Laval West | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Frulla, Hon. Liza | Liberal | Verdun—Saint-Henri—Saint-Paul—Pointe Saint-Charles | Quebec | Monday, May 13, 2002 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Gagliano, Hon. Alfonso L. | Liberal | Saint-Léonard—Saint-Michel | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Monday, January 14, 2002 |
Harvey, Hon. André | Liberal | Chicoutimi—Le Fjord | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Jennings, Hon. Marlene | Liberal | Notre-Dame-de-Grâce—Lachine | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Jobin, Christian | Liberal | Lévis-et-Chutes-de-la-Chaudière | Quebec | Monday, June 16, 2003 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Lanctôt, Robert | Liberal | Châteauguay | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Lavigne, Hon. Raymond | Liberal | Verdun—Saint-Henri—Saint-Paul—Pointe Saint-Charles | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Monday, March 25, 2002 |
Lincoln, Clifford | Liberal | Lac-Saint-Louis | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Marcil, Hon. Serge | Liberal | Beauharnois—Salaberry | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Martin, Right Hon. Paul | Liberal | LaSalle—Émard | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Normand, Hon. Gilbert | Liberal | Bellechasse—Etchemins—Montmagny—L'Islet | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Pacetti, Massimo | Liberal | Saint-Léonard—Saint-Michel | Quebec | Monday, May 13, 2002 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Paradis, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Brome—Missisquoi | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Patry, Bernard | Liberal | Pierrefonds—Dollard | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Pettigrew, Hon. Pierre | Liberal | Papineau—Saint-Denis | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Price, Hon. David | Liberal | Compton—Stanstead | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Proulx, Marcel | Liberal | Hull—Aylmer | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Robillard, Hon. Lucienne | Liberal | Westmount—Ville-Marie | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Saada, Hon. Jacques | Liberal | Brossard—La Prairie | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Scherrer, Hon. Hélène | Liberal | Louis-Hébert | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
St-Jacques, Diane | Liberal | Shefford | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
St-Julien, Guy | Liberal | Abitibi—Baie-James—Nunavik | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Thibeault, Yolande | Liberal | Saint-Lambert | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.