Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alcock, Hon. Reg | Liberal | Winnipeg South | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Duhamel, Hon. Ronald | Liberal | Saint Boniface | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Monday, January 14, 2002 |
Harvard, Hon. John | Liberal | Charleswood St. James—Assiniboia | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Thursday, May 6, 2004 |
Neville, Hon. Anita | Liberal | Winnipeg South Centre | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Pagtakhan, Hon. Rey | Liberal | Winnipeg North—St. Paul | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Simard, Hon. Raymond | Liberal | Saint Boniface | Manitoba | Monday, May 13, 2002 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.