Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 164 of 164
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adams, Hon. Peter | Liberal | Peterborough | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Alcock, Hon. Reg | Liberal | Winnipeg South | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Anderson, Hon. David A. | Liberal | Victoria | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Assad, Mark | Liberal | Gatineau | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Assadourian, Sarkis | Liberal | Brampton Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Augustine, Jean | Liberal | Etobicoke—Lakeshore | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Axworthy, Hon. Lloyd | Liberal | Winnipeg South Centre | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Baker, Hon. George | Liberal | Gander—Grand Falls | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bakopanos, Hon. Eleni | Liberal | Ahuntsic | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Barnes, Hon. Sue | Liberal | London West | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Beaumier, Colleen | Liberal | Brampton West—Mississauga | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bélair, Réginald | Liberal | Timmins—James Bay | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bélanger, Hon. Mauril | Liberal | Ottawa—Vanier | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bellemare, Eugène | Liberal | Ottawa—Orléans | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bennett, Hon. Carolyn | Liberal | St. Paul's | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bertrand, Robert | Liberal | Pontiac—Gatineau—Labelle | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bevilacqua, Maurizio | Liberal | Vaughan—King—Aurora | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Blondin-Andrew, Hon. Ethel | Liberal | Western Arctic | Northwest Territories | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bonin, Raymond | Liberal | Nickel Belt | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bonwick, Hon. Paul | Liberal | Simcoe—Grey | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Boudria, Hon. Don | Liberal | Glengarry—Prescott—Russell | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bradshaw, Hon. Claudette | Liberal | Moncton—Riverview—Dieppe | New Brunswick | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Brown, Bonnie | Liberal | Oakville | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bryden, John | Liberal | Ancaster—Dundas—Flamborough—Aldershot | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bulte, Hon. Sarmite | Liberal | Parkdale—High Park | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Byrne, Gerry | Liberal | Humber—St. Barbe—Baie Verte | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Caccia, Hon. Charles L. | Liberal | Davenport | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Calder, Murray | Liberal | Dufferin—Peel—Wellington—Grey | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Cannis, John | Liberal | Scarborough Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Caplan, Hon. Elinor | Liberal | Thornhill | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Carroll, Hon. Aileen | Liberal | Barrie—Simcoe—Bradford | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Cauchon, Hon. Martin | Liberal | Outremont | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Chamberlain, Hon. Brenda | Liberal | Guelph—Wellington | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Chan, Hon. Raymond | Liberal | Richmond | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Charbonneau, Hon. Yvon | Liberal | Anjou—Rivière-des-Prairies | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Chrétien, Right Hon. Jean | Liberal | Saint-Maurice | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Clouthier, Hec | Liberal | Renfrew—Nipissing—Pembroke | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Coderre, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Cohen, Shaughnessy | Liberal | Windsor—St. Clair | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Wednesday, December 9, 1998 |
Collenette, Hon. David | Liberal | Don Valley East | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Comuzzi, Hon. Joe | Liberal | Thunder Bay—Superior North | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Copps, Hon. Sheila | Liberal | Hamilton East | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Cotler, Hon. Irwin | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Monday, November 15, 1999 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Cullen, Hon. Roy | Liberal | Etobicoke North | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
DeVillers, Paul | Liberal | Simcoe North | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Dhaliwal, Hon. Herb | Liberal | Vancouver South—Burnaby | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Dion, Hon. Stéphane | Liberal | Saint-Laurent—Cartierville | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Discepola, Nick | Liberal | Vaudreuil—Soulanges | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Dromisky, Stan | Liberal | Thunder Bay—Atikokan | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Drouin, Claude | Liberal | Beauce | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Duhamel, Hon. Ronald | Liberal | Saint Boniface | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Easter, Hon. Wayne | Liberal | Malpeque | Prince Edward Island | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Eggleton, Hon. Art | Liberal | York Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Finestone, Hon. Sheila | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Tuesday, August 10, 1999 |
Finlay, John | Liberal | Oxford | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Folco, Raymonde | Liberal | Laval West | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Fontana, Hon. Joe | Liberal | London North Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Fry, Hon. Hedy | Liberal | Vancouver Centre | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Gagliano, Hon. Alfonso L. | Liberal | Saint-Léonard—Saint-Michel | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Gallaway, Hon. Roger | Liberal | Sarnia—Lambton | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Godfrey, Hon. John | Liberal | Don Valley West | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Goodale, Hon. Ralph | Liberal | Wascana | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Graham, Bill | Liberal | Toronto Centre—Rosedale | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Gray, Rt. Hon Herb | Liberal | Windsor West | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Grose, Ivan | Liberal | Oshawa | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Guarnieri, Hon. Albina | Liberal | Mississauga East | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Harb, Hon. Mac | Liberal | Ottawa Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Harvard, Hon. John | Liberal | Charleswood St. James—Assiniboia | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Harvey, Hon. André | Liberal | Chicoutimi—Le Fjord | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Hubbard, Hon. Charles | Liberal | Miramichi | New Brunswick | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Ianno, Hon. Tony | Liberal | Trinity—Spadina | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Iftody, David | Liberal | Provencher | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Jackson, Ovid | Liberal | Bruce—Grey—Owen Sound | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Jennings, Hon. Marlene | Liberal | Notre-Dame-de-Grâce—Lachine | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Jordan, Hon. Joe | Liberal | Leeds—Grenville | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Karetak-Lindell, Nancy | Liberal | Nunavut | Nunavut | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Karygiannis, Hon. Jim | Liberal | Scarborough—Agincourt | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Keyes, Hon. Stan | Liberal | Hamilton West | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Kilger, Bob | Liberal | Stormont—Dundas—Charlottenburgh | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Kilgour, Hon. David | Liberal | Edmonton Southeast | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Knutson, Gar | Liberal | Elgin—Middlesex—London | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Kraft Sloan, Karen | Liberal | York North | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Laliberte, Rick | Liberal | Desnethé—Missinippi—Churchill River | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lastewka, Hon. Walt | Liberal | St. Catharines | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lavigne, Hon. Raymond | Liberal | Verdun—Saint-Henri—Saint-Paul—Pointe Saint-Charles | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lee, Derek | Liberal | Scarborough—Rouge River | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Leung, Sophia | Liberal | Vancouver Kingsway | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Limoges, Rick | Liberal | Windsor—St. Clair | Ontario | Monday, April 12, 1999 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lincoln, Clifford | Liberal | Lac-Saint-Louis | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Longfield, Hon. Judi | Liberal | Whitby—Ajax | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
MacAulay, Hon. Lawrence | Liberal | Cardigan | Prince Edward Island | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Mahoney, Hon. Steve | Liberal | Mississauga West | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Malhi, Hon. Gurbax S. | Liberal | Bramalea—Gore—Malton—Springdale | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Maloney, John | Liberal | Erie—Lincoln | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Manley, Hon. John | Liberal | Ottawa South | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Marchi, Hon. Sergio | Liberal | York West | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Tuesday, August 3, 1999 |
Marleau, Hon. Diane | Liberal | Sudbury | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Martin, Right Hon. Paul | Liberal | LaSalle—Émard | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Massé, Hon. Marcel | Liberal | Hull—Aylmer | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Friday, September 10, 1999 |
Matthews, Bill | Liberal | Burin—St. George's | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McCormick, Larry | Liberal | Hastings—Frontenac—Lennox and Addington | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McGuire, Hon. Joe | Liberal | Egmont | Prince Edward Island | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McKay, Hon. John | Liberal | Scarborough East | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McLellan, Hon. Anne | Liberal | Edmonton West | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McTeague, Hon. Dan | Liberal | Pickering—Ajax—Uxbridge | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McWhinney, Ted | Liberal | Vancouver Quadra | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Mifflin, Hon. Fred | Liberal | Bonavista—Trinity—Conception | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Milliken, Hon. Peter | Liberal | Kingston and the Islands | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Mills, Dennis | Liberal | Toronto—Danforth | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Minna, Hon. Maria | Liberal | Beaches—East York | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Mitchell, Hon. Andy | Liberal | Parry Sound—Muskoka | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Murray, Ian | Liberal | Lanark—Carleton | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Myers, Lynn | Liberal | Waterloo—Wellington | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Nault, Hon. Robert D. | Liberal | Kenora—Rainy River | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Normand, Hon. Gilbert | Liberal | Bellechasse—Etchemins—Montmagny—L'Islet | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
O'Brien, Lawrence | Liberal | Labrador | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
O'Brien, Pat | Liberal | London—Fanshawe | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
O'Reilly, John | Liberal | Haliburton—Victoria—Brock | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Pagtakhan, Hon. Rey | Liberal | Winnipeg North—St. Paul | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Paradis, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Brome—Missisquoi | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Parent, Hon. Gilbert | Liberal | Niagara Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Parrish, Carolyn | Liberal | Mississauga Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Patry, Bernard | Liberal | Pierrefonds—Dollard | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Peric, Janko | Liberal | Cambridge | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Peterson, Hon. Jim | Liberal | Willowdale | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Pettigrew, Hon. Pierre | Liberal | Papineau—Saint-Denis | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Phinney, Beth | Liberal | Hamilton Mountain | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Pickard, Hon. Jerry | Liberal | Chatham—Kent Essex | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Pillitteri, Gary | Liberal | Niagara Falls | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Pratt, Hon. David | Liberal | Nepean—Carleton | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Price, Hon. David | Liberal | Compton—Stanstead | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Proud, George | Liberal | Hillsborough | Prince Edward Island | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Proulx, Marcel | Liberal | Hull—Aylmer | Quebec | Monday, November 15, 1999 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Provenzano, Carmen | Liberal | Sault Ste. Marie | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Redman, Hon. Karen | Liberal | Kitchener Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Reed, Julian | Liberal | Halton | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Richardson, John | Liberal | Perth—Middlesex | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Robillard, Hon. Lucienne | Liberal | Westmount—Ville-Marie | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Rock, Hon. Allan | Liberal | Etobicoke Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Saada, Hon. Jacques | Liberal | Brossard—La Prairie | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Scott, Hon. Andy | Liberal | Fredericton | New Brunswick | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Sekora, Lou | Liberal | Port Moody—Coquitlam—Port Coquitlam | British Columbia | Monday, March 30, 1998 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Serré, Benoît | Liberal | Timiskaming—Cochrane | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Sgro, Hon. Judy A. | Liberal | York West | Ontario | Monday, November 15, 1999 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Shepherd, Alex | Liberal | Durham | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Speller, Hon. Bob | Liberal | Haldimand—Norfolk—Brant | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
St-Jacques, Diane | Liberal | Shefford | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
St-Julien, Guy | Liberal | Abitibi—Baie-James—Nunavik | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
St. Denis, Brent | Liberal | Algoma—Manitoulin | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Steckle, Paul | Liberal | Huron—Bruce | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Stewart, Hon. Christine | Liberal | Northumberland | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Stewart, Hon. Jane | Liberal | Brant | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Szabo, Paul | Liberal | Mississauga South | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Telegdi, Hon. Andrew | Liberal | Kitchener—Waterloo | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Thibeault, Yolande | Liberal | Saint-Lambert | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Torsney, Hon. Paddy | Liberal | Burlington | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Ur, Rose-Marie | Liberal | Lambton—Kent—Middlesex | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Valeri, Hon. Tony | Liberal | Stoney Creek | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Vanclief, Hon. Lyle | Liberal | Prince Edward—Hastings | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Volpe, Hon. Joseph | Liberal | Eglinton—Lawrence | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Wappel, Tom | Liberal | Scarborough Southwest | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Whelan, Susan | Liberal | Essex | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Wilfert, Hon. Bryon | Liberal | Oak Ridges | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Wood, Bob | Liberal | Nipissing | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.