Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Blaikie, Hon. Bill | NDP | Winnipeg—Transcona | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Desjarlais, Bev | NDP | Churchill | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Martin, Pat | NDP | Winnipeg Centre | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Wasylycia-Leis, Judy | NDP | Winnipeg North Centre | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.